TX HB314 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to use of compensatory education allotment funding to provide assistance to students at risk of dropping out of school who are pregnant or who are parents and to reporting through the Public Education Information Management System.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to use of compensatory education allotment funding to provide assistance to students at risk of dropping out of school who are pregnant or who are parents and to reporting through the Public Education Information Management System.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#385 (Y: 83 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - Read 2nd time RV#353 (Y: 93 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateReferred to Education
2019-04-17SenateRead first time
2019-04-16SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-16HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-16HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16HouseRecord vote RV#385
2019-04-16HousePassed
2019-04-16HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-15HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-15HouseRecord vote RV#353
2019-04-15HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-15HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-15HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-13HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-06HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-06HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-02-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-02-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-02-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Public Education
2019-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-11-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2391 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Education

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback