TX HB3219 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Laid on the table subject to call
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Laid on the table subject to call
Summary
Relating to the creation and operation of a council to increase state efforts to offer service-enriched housing through increased coordination of housing and health services.
Title
Relating to the creation and operation of a council to increase state efforts to offer service-enriched housing through increased coordination of housing and health services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-14 | Laid on the table subject to call | |
2009-05-14 | Companion considered in lieu of | |
2009-05-14 | Postponed | |
2009-05-14 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2009-05-12 | Postponed | |
2009-05-12 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2009-05-06 | Postponed | |
2009-05-06 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2009-05-05 | Postponed | |
2009-05-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-04 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-02 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-28 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-28 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-27 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-21 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-21 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-02 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-02 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-02 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-02 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-18 | Referred to Human Services | |
2009-03-18 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1878 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Subjects
Health
Health--General
Housing
HOUSING & HEALTH SERVICES COORDINATION COUNCIL
Housing--Disabled Persons
Housing--General
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Health--General
Housing
HOUSING & HEALTH SERVICES COORDINATION COUNCIL
Housing--Disabled Persons
Housing--General
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF