TX HB3286 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-05 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-05 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of game rooms in certain counties.
Title
Relating to the regulation of game rooms in certain counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#494 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-27 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-21 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-13 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-13 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-28 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2017-03-28 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-08 | House | Filed |