TX HB3306 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the disclosure of information concerning the corporate governance structure of certain insurers and related entities; providing an administrative penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the disclosure of information concerning the corporate governance structure of certain insurers and related entities; providing an administrative penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#962 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-24HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-22SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-20SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-09SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-06SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-05-06SenateRead first time
2019-05-06SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03HouseRecord vote RV#962
2019-05-03HousePassed
2019-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-03HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-03HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-04-30HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-23HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-16HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-09HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-18HouseReferred to Insurance
2019-03-18HouseRead first time
2019-03-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2122 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Business & Commerce

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback