TX HB356 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the requirements of an affidavit supporting the installation and use of a mobile tracking device.
Title
Relating to the requirements of an affidavit supporting the installation and use of a mobile tracking device.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB112 (Same As) 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21