TX HB3640 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee
Pending: House County Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee
Pending: House County Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation and operations of a health care provider participation program by the El Paso County Hospital District.
Title
Relating to the creation and operations of a health care provider participation program by the El Paso County Hospital District.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Moody [D] | Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D] | Sen. Cesar Blanco [D] | Rep. Lina Ortega [D] |
Rep. Art Fierro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | House | Companion considered in lieu of in committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-20 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2019-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1751 (Same As) 2019-05-31 - Effective immediately
Subjects
EL PASO COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT
Health Care Providers
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
Health Care Providers
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3640 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03640I.htm |