TX HB3666 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorizing a public safety fee for the compulsory inspection of motor vehicles.
Title
Relating to authorizing a public safety fee for the compulsory inspection of motor vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2013-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-18 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2013-04-10 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2013-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2013-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in s/c |
2013-04-10 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-04-03 | House | Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair |
2013-03-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2013-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
VEHICLE INSPECTIONS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
VEHICLE INSPECTIONS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General