TX HB3933 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to consumer protections against billing and limitations on information reported by consumer reporting agencies.
Title
Relating to consumer protections against billing and limitations on information reported by consumer reporting agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-26 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2019-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1264 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Consumer Protection
CREDIT REPORTS
Health Care Providers
HEALTH MAINTENANCE ORGANIZATIONS
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
CREDIT REPORTS
Health Care Providers
HEALTH MAINTENANCE ORGANIZATIONS
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3933 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03933I.htm |