TX HB3946 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to immunity from liability of public and private schools and security personnel employed by those schools for certain actions of security personnel.
Title
Relating to immunity from liability of public and private schools and security personnel employed by those schools for certain actions of security personnel.
Sponsors
Rep. Cole Hefner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB811 (Similar To) 2019-05-07 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Law Enforcement
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Law Enforcement
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3946 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03946I.htm |