TX HB3991 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the development of an individualized education program for a child in public school.
Title
Relating to the development of an individualized education program for a child in public school.
Sponsors
Rep. Alma Allen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2015-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers