TX HB4018 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to legislative oversight and funding of improvement and modernization projects for state agency information resources.
Title
Relating to legislative oversight and funding of improvement and modernization projects for state agency information resources.
Sponsors
Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. James Frank [R] | Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R] |
Rep. Eddie Morales [D] | Sen. Jane Nelson [R] | Sen. Beverly Powell [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1702 (Y: 117 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#972 (Y: 120 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - Amended RV#928 (Y: 125 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#972 (Y: 120 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - Amended RV#928 (Y: 125 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-18 | Effective immediately | |
2021-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2021-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-28 | House | Record vote RV#1702 |
2021-05-28 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | House | Record vote RV#972 |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed |
2021-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#928 |
2021-05-10 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-10 | House | Amended 1-Capriglione |
2021-05-10 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2021-05-10 | House | Postponed 5/10/21 8:00 PM |
2021-05-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
INFORMATION RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT OF
Legislature
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
INFORMATION RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT OF
Legislature
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control