TX HB4434 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-15 - Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-15 - Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Texas First Early High School Completion Program and the Texas First Scholarship Program.
Title
Relating to the Texas First Early High School Completion Program and the Texas First Scholarship Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#445 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-15 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-25 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-25 | House | Record vote RV#445 |
2023-04-25 | House | Passed |
2023-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-24 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-24 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-30 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-03-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-30 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2023-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS