TX HB4445 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the safe and efficient provision of pilot services by the board of pilot commissioners for Harris County ports.
Title
Relating to the safe and efficient provision of pilot services by the board of pilot commissioners for Harris County ports.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-03-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2223 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY, TEXAS
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous