TX HB455 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to inquiries about and the consideration of criminal history record information regarding applicants for employment.
Title
Relating to inquiries about and the consideration of criminal history record information regarding applicants for employment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-03-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-03-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-03-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-03-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-10 | House | Filed |