TX HB509 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Introduced on January 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to the persons authorized to draw a blood specimen from a vehicle operator to test for alcohol concentration or other intoxicating substances.
Title
Relating to the persons authorized to draw a blood specimen from a vehicle operator to test for alcohol concentration or other intoxicating substances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-04 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | |
2009-05-04 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-23 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-22 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-16 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-16 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-16 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-16 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-15 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-15 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-07 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-04-07 | Correction in referral | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Public Safety | |
2009-02-18 | Read first time | |
2009-01-08 | Filed |
Subjects
BLOOD & MEDICAL TESTS
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID