TX HB579 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-09 - Left pending in subcommittee
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-09 - Left pending in subcommittee
Summary
Relating to certain costs on conviction in certain intoxication and drug cases.
Title
Relating to certain costs on conviction in certain intoxication and drug cases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-09 | Left pending in subcommittee | |
2009-03-09 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | |
2009-03-09 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2009-03-09 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-25 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-02-25 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-02-18 | Read first time | |
2009-01-12 | Filed |
Subjects
Courts
Courts--General
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
Courts--General
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State