TX HB623 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-27 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-27 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an exemption from ad valorem taxation of tangible personal property consisting of animal feed held by the owner of the property for sale at retail.
Title
Relating to an exemption from ad valorem taxation of tangible personal property consisting of animal feed held by the owner of the property for sale at retail.
Sponsors
Rep. Cody Harris [R] | Rep. Richard Raymond [D] | Rep. Charles Anderson [R] | Rep. Eddie Morales [D] |
Rep. Bryan Slaton [R] | Rep. David Spiller [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#536 (Y: 144 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-26 | House | Record vote RV#536 |
2023-04-26 | House | Passed |
2023-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-25 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-11-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HJR47 (Enabling for) 2023-05-02 - Referred to Local Government
Subjects
Agriculture
Animals
Property Interests
Property Interests--Personal Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Animals
Property Interests
Property Interests--Personal Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions