TX HB8 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-04 - Referred to Jurisprudence
Pending: Senate Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-04 - Referred to Jurisprudence
Pending: Senate Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to access by a hiring law enforcement agency to an applicant's employment records.
Title
Relating to access by a hiring law enforcement agency to an applicant's employment records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#392 (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Jurisprudence |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-22 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-22 | House | Record vote RV#392 |
2021-04-22 | House | Passed |
2021-04-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-21 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-21 | House | Amended 1-P. King |
2021-04-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2021-04-16 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-03-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-03-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-03-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-03-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2021-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1205 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Referred to Jurisprudence
SB1205 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Referred to Jurisprudence
SB1205 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Referred to Jurisprudence