TX HB866 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-18 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on January 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-18 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to a study regarding ad valorem tax relief through the use of a circuit breaker program.
Title
Relating to a study regarding ad valorem tax relief through the use of a circuit breaker program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-18 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-18 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-18 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to Ways & Means | |
2009-02-23 | Read first time | |
2009-01-29 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1928 (Same As) 2009-03-24 - Referred to Finance
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-State Administration
Taxation--Property-Tax Rate
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-State Administration
Taxation--Property-Tax Rate