TX HCR121 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Declaring May 15, 2013, as Ramon Ayala Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Declaring May 15, 2013, as Ramon Ayala Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
Sen. Roland Gutierrez [D] | Rep. Trey Martinez Fischer [D] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] | Sen. Leticia Van De Putte [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-22 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-22 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-16 | House | Adopted |
2013-05-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-05-17 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-05-16 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-05-14 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-05-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
RAMON AYALA DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates