TX HR1174 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating members of Delta Alpha Kappa Zeta Chapter in Fort Bend County on the organization's founding.
Title
Congratulating members of Delta Alpha Kappa Zeta Chapter in Fort Bend County on the organization's founding.
Sponsors
Rep. John Bucy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-04-28 | House | Adopted |
2023-04-28 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-04-28 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-04-26 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-04-20 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-04-18 | House | Filed |