TX HR1457 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring the Stars and Strides Stables Therapeutic Riding Center in Weatherford.
Title
Honoring the Stars and Strides Stables Therapeutic Riding Center in Weatherford.
Sponsors
Sen. Phil King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-10 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-10 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-10 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-05-08 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-30 | House | Filed |