TX HR1533 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Chuck Orr on being named the 2015 Outstanding Farmer/Rancher of the Year by the Burnet Chamber of Commerce.
Title
Congratulating Chuck Orr on being named the 2015 Outstanding Farmer/Rancher of the Year by the Burnet Chamber of Commerce.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-04-16 | House | Adopted |
2015-04-16 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-04-16 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-04-13 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-03-24 | House | Filed |