TX HR1947 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the Bushland High School volleyball team on advancing to the 2022 UIL 3A state championship game.
Title
Congratulating the Bushland High School volleyball team on advancing to the 2022 UIL 3A state championship game.
Sponsors
Rep. Four Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-25 | House | Adopted |
2023-05-25 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-05-25 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-05-23 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-05-17 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-05-16 | House | Filed |