TX HR2094 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-27 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-27 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the staff members of State Representative Rhetta Andrews Bowers for their service during the 88th Legislative Session.
Title
Commending the staff members of State Representative Rhetta Andrews Bowers for their service during the 88th Legislative Session.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-25 | House | Adopted |
2023-05-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-05-23 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-05-18 | House | Filed |
Subjects
INGLIS, NATOYA
LOPEZ, EMMA
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary
RIDEAUX, ARIA
TREIBER, ANDRE
WILLIS, DEBBRA
LOPEZ, EMMA
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary
RIDEAUX, ARIA
TREIBER, ANDRE
WILLIS, DEBBRA