TX HR2101 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the members of Team Spicy Ketchup of Universal City on their performance at the FIRST Tech Challenge World Robotics Championship in Houston.
Title
Congratulating the members of Team Spicy Ketchup of Universal City on their performance at the FIRST Tech Challenge World Robotics Championship in Houston.
Sponsors
Rep. Ray Lopez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-29 | House | Adopted |
2023-05-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-05-23 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-05-18 | House | Filed |