TX HR2286 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Tanya Debose of Houston for her work in behalf of the historic African American community of Independence Heights.
Title
Commending Tanya Debose of Houston for her work in behalf of the historic African American community of Independence Heights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-29 | House | Adopted |
2023-05-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-05-26 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-05-24 | House | Filed |