TX HR358 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-06 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-06 - Reported enrolled
Summary
In memory of W. A. "Dub" Jackson III of Dallas.
Title
In memory of W. A. "Dub" Jackson III of Dallas.
Sponsors
Rep. Terri Hodge [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-06 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-02-26 | Adopted | |
2009-02-26 | Laid before the House | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-02-24 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-02-10 | Filed |