TX HR676 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring Neal Katz for his service as executive director of the Collin County Republican Party.
Title
Honoring Neal Katz for his service as executive director of the Collin County Republican Party.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Leach [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-03-05 | House | Adopted |
2015-03-05 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-03-05 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-03-02 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-02-23 | House | Filed |