TX HR72 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Julie Moore on being honored as the 2022 Joe B. Fulgham Agriculturalist of the Year in Henderson County.
Title
Congratulating Julie Moore on being honored as the 2022 Joe B. Fulgham Agriculturalist of the Year in Henderson County.
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-08 - House - Adopted RV#45 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-03-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-03-08 | House | Record vote RV#45 |
2023-03-08 | House | Adopted |
2023-03-08 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-03-06 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-01-23 | House | Filed |