TX HR935 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Karen Prewitt of IDEA Palmview College Preparatory on earning certification from the National Board for Professional Teaching Standards.
Title
Congratulating Karen Prewitt of IDEA Palmview College Preparatory on earning certification from the National Board for Professional Teaching Standards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-14 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-04-14 | House | Adopted |
2023-04-14 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-04-14 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-04-12 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-04-05 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-04-03 | House | Filed |