TX SB10 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to employment, higher education, and state purchasing programs for veterans.
Title
Relating to employment, higher education, and state purchasing programs for veterans.
Sponsors
Sen. Leticia Van De Putte [D] | Sen. Donna Campbell [R] | Rep. Yvonne Davis [D] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] |
Sen. Jose Rodriguez [D] | Sen. Jose Menendez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-22 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2013-04-22 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-19 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-10 | Senate | No action taken in committee |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-03 | Senate | No action taken in committee |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Permission to introduce |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
Military & Veterans
State Employees
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
Military & Veterans
State Employees