TX SB1016 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to an audit by the Texas Education Agency of public school professional development training requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to an audit by the Texas Education Agency of public school professional development training requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-07HouseReferred to Public Education
2019-05-07HouseRead first time
2019-05-03HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-05-03SenateReported engrossed
2019-05-03SenateRecord vote
2019-05-03SenatePassed
2019-05-03SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-03SenateRecord vote
2019-05-03SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03SenateAmended
2019-05-03SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Powell
2019-05-03SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-03SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-01SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-30SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-30SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-23SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-23SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-23SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-23SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Education
2019-03-07SenateRead first time
2019-02-22SenateFiled
2019-02-22SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback