TX SB1080 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a mitigation program and fees for the Lost Pines Groundwater Conservation District.
Title
Relating to a mitigation program and fees for the Lost Pines Groundwater Conservation District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1777 (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1777 (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-15 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-23 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Read |
2023-05-23 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2023-05-17 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2023-05-17 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-17 | House | Record vote RV#1777 |
2023-05-17 | House | Passed |
2023-05-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-16 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2023-05-16 | House | Amended 1-Gerdes |
2023-05-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-16 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-05-03 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-10 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2023-04-10 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-29 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Passed |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Amended |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Kolkhorst |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3314 (Similar To) 2023-03-15 - Referred to Natural Resources
HB3314 (Similar To) 2023-03-15 - Referred to Natural Resources
HB3314 (Similar To) 2023-03-15 - Referred to Natural Resources
Subjects
LOST PINES GROUNDWATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.