TX SB1264 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-27 - Returned to Calendars Committee
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-27 - Returned to Calendars Committee
Summary
Relating to the participation of certain transportation entities and hospital districts in the comptroller of public accounts' travel services contracts.
Title
Relating to the participation of certain transportation entities and hospital districts in the comptroller of public accounts' travel services contracts.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Smith [R] | Sen. Kirk Watson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-27 | Returned to Calendars Committee | |
2009-05-27 | Withdrawn from calendar | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-25 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-23 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | |
2009-05-23 | Withdrawn from calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-18 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-15 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-15 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-14 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-14 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-14 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-20 | Referred to Transportation | |
2009-04-20 | Read first time | |
2009-04-16 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-16 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-16 | Record vote | |
2009-04-16 | Passed | |
2009-04-16 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-16 | Record vote | |
2009-04-16 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-16 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-16 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-16 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-02 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-02 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-02 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Government Organization | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-03 | Filed | |
2009-03-03 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2899 (Similar To) 2009-05-15 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Transportation
Transportation--Mass Transit
TRAVEL
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Transportation
Transportation--Mass Transit
TRAVEL