TX SB1454 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the ownership, sale, lease, and disposition of property and management of assets of an open-enrollment charter school.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the ownership, sale, lease, and disposition of property and management of assets of an open-enrollment charter school.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-25 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1642 (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective immediately
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-25SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-25HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-25SenateRecord vote
2019-05-25SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2019-05-25SenateRead
2019-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-22SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1642
2019-05-22HousePassed
2019-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-21HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-21HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-07HouseReferred to Public Education
2019-05-07HouseRead first time
2019-05-03HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-05-02SenateReported engrossed
2019-05-02SenateRecord vote
2019-05-02SenatePassed
2019-05-02SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-02SenateRecord vote
2019-05-02SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-02SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-02SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-02SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-02SenateAmended
2019-05-02SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Taylor
2019-05-02SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-02SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-29SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-29SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-23SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-23SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-16SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-16SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-08SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Education
2019-03-14SenateRead first time
2019-03-04SenateFiled
2019-03-04SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

SB2314 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Education

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback