TX SB1517 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to prohibiting certain academic boycotts of foreign countries by public institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to prohibiting certain academic boycotts of foreign countries by public institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1934 (Y: 103 N: 26 NV: 16 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1934 (Y: 103 N: 26 NV: 16 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-18 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-28 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-25 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2023-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2023-05-22 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2023-05-22 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1934 |
2023-05-22 | House | Passed |
2023-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-19 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2023-05-19 | House | Amended 1-Paul |
2023-05-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-19 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-03 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-05-02 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2023-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-27 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2023-04-27 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-26 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Reported from s/c favorably with substitute |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Considered by subcommittee |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Left pending in subcommittee |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Testimony taken in subcommittee |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Considered by subcommittee |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3851 (Same As) 2023-04-17 - Left pending in committee
HB3851 (Same As) 2023-04-17 - Left pending in committee
HB3851 (Same As) 2023-04-17 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
INTERNATIONAL RELATIONS
TERRORISM & INTERNAL SECURITY
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
INTERNATIONAL RELATIONS
TERRORISM & INTERNAL SECURITY