TX SB1582 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-30 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-30 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to the criminal penalty for capturing, transporting, or transplanting white-tailed or mule deer without a permit.
Title
Relating to the criminal penalty for capturing, transporting, or transplanting white-tailed or mule deer without a permit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-30 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed | |
2009-03-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4284 (Same As) 2009-04-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars