TX SB1667 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-25 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-25 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the delivery of certain transportation services under Medicaid and certain other health and human services programs.
Title
Relating to the delivery of certain transportation services under Medicaid and certain other health and human services programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Buckingham [R] | Sen. Donna Campbell [R] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] | Sen. Nathan Johnson [D] |
Sen. Jose Menendez [D] | Sen. Borris Miles [D] | Sen. Royce West [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1576 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1667 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01667I.htm |