TX SB1925 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the designation of a portion of U.S. Highway 271 as the Sergeant Jay M. Hoskins Memorial Highway.
Title
Relating to the designation of a portion of U.S. Highway 271 as the Sergeant Jay M. Hoskins Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Rep. Erwin Cain [R] | Sen. Kevin Eltife [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-26 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-26 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-25 | House passage reported | |
2011-05-25 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-25 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-23 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-20 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-20 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-20 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-20 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-20 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-19 | Referred to Transportation | |
2011-05-19 | Read first time | |
2011-05-17 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-05-17 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-17 | Record vote | |
2011-05-17 | Passed | |
2011-05-17 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-17 | Record vote | |
2011-05-17 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-17 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-17 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-17 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-17 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-17 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-13 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-11 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-11 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-11 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-02 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2011-05-02 | Read first time | |
2011-05-02 | Permission to introduce | |
2011-04-29 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |