TX SB1978 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 79-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 79-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the protection of membership in, affiliation with, and support provided to religious organizations.
Title
Relating to the protection of membership in, affiliation with, and support provided to religious organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1530 (Y: 79 N: 64 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#1513 (Y: 79 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1512 (Y: 65 N: 76 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Amendment adopted as amended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Amendment amended (Y: 12 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 12 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1530 (Y: 79 N: 64 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#1513 (Y: 79 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1512 (Y: 65 N: 76 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Amendment adopted as amended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Amendment amended (Y: 12 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 12 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-21 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | House | Record vote RV#1530 |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed |
2019-05-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-20 | House | Record vote RV#1513 |
2019-05-20 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-20 | House | Record vote RV#1512 |
2019-05-20 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 2-J. González, et al. |
2019-05-20 | House | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2 |
2019-05-20 | House | Amendment(s) offered 2-J. González, M. González, J.E. Johnson, Israel, and Zwiener |
2019-05-20 | House | Amended 1-Krause |
2019-05-20 | House | Point of order overruled Rule 4, Section 16, and Rule 4, Section 18(a); Article III, Section 37 |
2019-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2019-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-16 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-05-16 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-16 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Remarks ordered printed |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA5 Rodríguez |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA4 Menéndez |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA3 Rodríguez |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Amendment adopted as amended FA1 Hughes |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Amendment amended FA2 Hughes |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Substitute amendment offered FA2 Menéndez |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Amendment to amendment offered FA2 Hughes |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Point of order overruled |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Point of order |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hughes |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3172 (Same As) 2019-05-09 - Returned to committee
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Family
Family--Marriage Relationship
Religion
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Employees
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Family
Family--Marriage Relationship
Religion
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Employees