TX SB2 | 2011 | 82nd Legislature 1st Special
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-19 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-19 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriating money for the support of state government for the period beginning September 1, 2011, and ending August 31, 2013; and authorizing and prescribing conditions, limitations, rules, and procedures for allocating and expending the appropriated funds.
Title
Appropriating money for the support of state government for the period beginning September 1, 2011, and ending August 31, 2013; and authorizing and prescribing conditions, limitations, rules, and procedures for allocating and expending the appropriated funds.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Ogden [R] | Rep. Jim Pitts [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-19 | Effective immediately | |
2011-07-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-07-06 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-06-28 | Sent to the Comptroller | |
2011-06-28 | Signed in the House | |
2011-06-28 | Signed in Senate-Art III Sec 49a Tx. Const. | |
2011-06-27 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-06-27 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-06-27 | Remarks ordered printed | |
2011-06-27 | Record vote | |
2011-06-27 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2011-06-27 | Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds | |
2011-06-27 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-06-27 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-27 | Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution | |
2011-06-27 | Record vote | |
2011-06-27 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2011-06-27 | House adopts resolution to go outside bounds | |
2011-06-24 | Corrected Conference Committee Report distributed | |
2011-06-24 | Corrected Conference committee report filed | |
2011-06-24 | Conf. Comm. Report distributed | |
2011-06-24 | Conference committee report filed | |
2011-06-16 | House appoints conferees w/inst-reported | |
2011-06-16 | House grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2011-06-16 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-16 | Record vote | |
2011-06-16 | House appoints conferees with instructions | |
2011-06-16 | House grants request for conference committee | |
2011-06-14 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-06-14 | Senate requests conference committee-reported | |
2011-06-14 | Senate refuses to concur-reported | |
2011-06-13 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2011-06-13 | Senate requests conference committee | |
2011-06-13 | Senate refuses to concur | |
2011-06-13 | Read | |
2011-06-13 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2011-06-13 | House passage as amended reported | |
2011-06-10 | Reason for vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-10 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-10 | Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution | |
2011-06-10 | Record vote | |
2011-06-10 | Passed as amended | |
2011-06-10 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-06-10 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-10 | Amended | |
2011-06-10 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-10 | Record vote | |
2011-06-10 | Amendment fails of adoption | |
2011-06-10 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-10 | Amended | |
2011-06-10 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-10 | Amended | |
2011-06-10 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-06-09 | Reason for vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-09 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-09 | Record vote | |
2011-06-09 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-06-09 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-09 | Record vote | |
2011-06-09 | Amended | |
2011-06-09 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-06-09 | Amended | |
2011-06-09 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-09 | Amendment adopted as amended | |
2011-06-09 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-09 | Amendment amended | |
2011-06-09 | Record vote | |
2011-06-09 | Amendment to amendment tabled | |
2011-06-09 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-06-09 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-09 | Amendment adopted as amended | |
2011-06-09 | Amendment amended | |
2011-06-09 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-06-09 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-06-09 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-06-09 | Vote reconsidered | |
2011-06-09 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-09 | Record vote | |
2011-06-09 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-06-09 | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) | |
2011-06-09 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-06-09 | Amended | |
2011-06-09 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-09 | Amended | |
2011-06-09 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-06-09 | Amended | |
2011-06-09 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-06-09 | Amended | |
2011-06-09 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-06-09 | Amended | |
2011-06-09 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-06-09 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-06-09 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-09 | Record vote | |
2011-06-09 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-06-09 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-09 | Record vote | |
2011-06-09 | Amendment to amendment tabled | |
2011-06-09 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-06-09 | Amended | |
2011-06-09 | Amended | |
2011-06-09 | Amended | |
2011-06-09 | Amended | |
2011-06-09 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-09 | Record vote | |
2011-06-09 | Motion to table fails | |
2011-06-09 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-06-09 | Amended | |
2011-06-09 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-06-07 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-07 | Record vote | |
2011-06-07 | Calendars Committee rule adopted | |
2011-06-09 | Placed on Major State Calendar | |
2011-06-06 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-06-06 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-06-06 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-06-05 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-06-04 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-06-04 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-06-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-06-04 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2011-06-04 | Read first time | |
2011-06-04 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-06-03 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-06-03 | Record vote | |
2011-06-03 | Passed | |
2011-06-03 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-06-03 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-06-03 | Record vote | |
2011-06-03 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-06-03 | Record vote | |
2011-06-03 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-06-03 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-06-03 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-03 | Amended | |
2011-06-03 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-06-03 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-06-03 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-06-03 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-03 | Ordered not printed | |
2011-06-03 | Printing rule suspended | |
2011-06-03 | Meeting cancelled | |
2011-06-03 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-06-02 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-06-02 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-06-02 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-06-02 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-06-02 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-31 | Referred to Finance | |
2011-05-31 | Read first time | |
2011-05-31 | Filed | |
2011-05-31 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
AGING & DISABILITY SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
AVAILABLE SCHOOL FUND
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--School Districts
Elections
Elections--Registration & Suffrage
EMERGENCY COMMUNICATIONS, COMMISSION ON STATE
EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF TEXAS
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
FOUNDATION SCHOOL FUND
FOUNDATION SCHOOL PROGRAM
GENERAL LAND OFFICE
Governor
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Oil & Gas
PERMANENT SCHOOL FUND
PIPELINE SAFETY
RAILROAD COMMISSION
SECRETARY OF STATE
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
AVAILABLE SCHOOL FUND
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--School Districts
Elections
Elections--Registration & Suffrage
EMERGENCY COMMUNICATIONS, COMMISSION ON STATE
EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF TEXAS
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
FOUNDATION SCHOOL FUND
FOUNDATION SCHOOL PROGRAM
GENERAL LAND OFFICE
Governor
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Oil & Gas
PERMANENT SCHOOL FUND
PIPELINE SAFETY
RAILROAD COMMISSION
SECRETARY OF STATE
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations