TX SB2075 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-04 - Committee report printed and distributed
Status: Introduced on March 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-04 - Committee report printed and distributed
Summary
Relating to the consequences of successfully completing a term of deferred adjudication community supervision with respect to the expunction or use of certain criminal history records and files.
Title
Relating to the consequences of successfully completing a term of deferred adjudication community supervision with respect to the expunction or use of certain criminal history records and files.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-04 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-04 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-28 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-04-27 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-04-27 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-23 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-04-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-21 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-03-31 | Read first time | |
2009-03-12 | Filed | |
2009-03-12 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2213 (Same As) 2009-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
EXPUNCTION OF RECORDS
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
EXPUNCTION OF RECORDS
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions