TX SB212 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a reporting requirement for certain incidents of sexual harassment, sexual assault, dating violence, or stalking at certain public and private institutions of higher education; creating a criminal offense; authorizing administrative penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a reporting requirement for certain incidents of sexual harassment, sexual assault, dating violence, or stalking at certain public and private institutions of higher education; creating a criminal offense; authorizing administrative penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1613 (Y: 128 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 See remarks for effective date
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-22SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-22SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1613
2019-05-22HousePassed
2019-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-21HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-21HouseLaid out as postponed business
2019-05-20HousePostponed 5/21/19 10:00 AM
2019-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-14HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-14HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2019-04-24HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-24HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-24HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Higher Education
2019-04-01HouseRead first time
2019-03-27HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-03-26SenateReported engrossed
2019-03-26SenateRecord vote
2019-03-26SenatePassed
2019-03-26SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-26SenateRecord vote
2019-03-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-03-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-03-26SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-03-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-03-26SenateAmended
2019-03-26SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Huffman
2019-03-26SenateRead 2nd time
2019-03-26SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-03-26SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-18SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-03-07SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-07SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-07SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-01SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-02-01SenateRead first time
2018-11-30SenateFiled
2018-11-30SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3814 (Similar To) 2019-03-19 - Referred to Higher Education

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback