TX SB2186 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Recommendations filed with the Senate
Pending: Senate Ports, Select Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Recommendations filed with the Senate
Pending: Senate Ports, Select Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the powers and duties of the Port of Corpus Christi Authority of Nueces County, Texas.
Title
Relating to the powers and duties of the Port of Corpus Christi Authority of Nueces County, Texas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Recommendations filed with the Senate |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Transmitted to the Governor |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Ports, Select |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4640 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
HB4640 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
HB4640 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Subjects
PORT OF CORPUS CHRISTI AUTHORITY OF NUECES COUNTY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB2186 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB02186I.htm |