TX SB2250 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to low income housing tax credits administered by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs.
Title
Relating to low income housing tax credits administered by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |