TX SB2317 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the liability for unpaid tuition and fees at a public institution of higher education due to a misclassification of certain military personnel and their dependents.
Title
Relating to the liability for unpaid tuition and fees at a public institution of higher education due to a misclassification of certain military personnel and their dependents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-07 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-05-06 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-04-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-18 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
AUDITS & AUDITORS
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--Tuition
Military & Veterans
VETERANS COMMISSION, TEXAS
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--Tuition
Military & Veterans
VETERANS COMMISSION, TEXAS