TX SB2452 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on adoption of const. amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the provision by the Texas Water Development Board of financial assistance for the development of certain projects in economically distressed areas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the provision by the Texas Water Development Board of financial assistance for the development of certain projects in economically distressed areas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-25 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#1627 (Y: 103 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on adoption of const. amendment
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-25SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-25HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-25SenateRecord vote
2019-05-25SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2019-05-25SenateRead
2019-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-22SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1627
2019-05-22HousePassed
2019-05-22HouseAmendment withdrawn 1-Nevárez
2019-05-22HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
2019-05-22HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-Nevárez
2019-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-21HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-21HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-21HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-16HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2019-05-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-14HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-13HouseReferred to Natural Resources
2019-05-13HouseRead first time
2019-05-08HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-05-08SenateReported engrossed
2019-05-08SenateRecord vote
2019-05-08SenatePassed
2019-05-08SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-08SenateRecord vote
2019-05-08SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-08SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-08SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-08SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-08SenateAmended
2019-05-08SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Perry
2019-05-08SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-08SenateAmended
2019-05-08SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Perry
2019-05-08SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-08SenateRecord vote
2019-05-08SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-08SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-23SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-23SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-23SenateVote reconsidered in committee
2019-04-23SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-17SenatePosting rule suspended
2019-04-15SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Water & Rural Affairs
2019-03-27SenateRead first time
2019-03-27SenatePermission to introduce
2019-03-21SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

SJR79 (Enabling for) 2019-05-28 - Filed with the Secretary of State

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB2452
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB02452I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB02452S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB02452E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB02452H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB02452F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-08-F.PDF#page=29
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-08-F.PDF#page=30
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-08-F.PDF#page=31
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB2452&RcdVtNo=1627&Ch=H&Dt=05/22/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-25-F.PDF#page=10

Bill Comments

feedback