TX SB2455 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Recommendations filed with the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Recommendations filed with the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the territory and board of directors of the Bell County Water Control and Improvement District No. 1.
Title
Relating to the territory and board of directors of the Bell County Water Control and Improvement District No. 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Recommendations filed with the Senate |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Transmitted to the Governor |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2105 (Similar To) 2019-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
BELL COUNTY WATER CONTROL & IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NO. 1
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities--Water Control Improve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities--Water Control Improve Dist.
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB2455 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB02455I.htm |