TX SB2543 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to the enforcement of rules by the Harris-Galveston Subsidence District and the Fort Bend Subsidence District; providing penalties.
Title
Relating to the enforcement of rules by the Harris-Galveston Subsidence District and the Fort Bend Subsidence District; providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the House | |
2009-06-02 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-30 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-30 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-30 | Record vote | |
2009-05-30 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2009-05-30 | Read | |
2009-05-30 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-28 | House passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Passed | |
2009-05-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-27 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-27 | Amended | |
2009-05-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-25 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-21 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-19 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-19 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-15 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-05-15 | Read first time | |
2009-05-12 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-05-12 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-12 | Record vote | |
2009-05-12 | Passed | |
2009-05-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-12 | Record vote | |
2009-05-12 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-12 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-12 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-12 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-11 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-07 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-07 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-06 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-21 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2009-04-21 | Read first time | |
2009-04-21 | Permission to introduce | |
2009-04-21 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4212 (Similar To) 2009-05-19 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
Subjects
FORT BEND SUBSIDENCE DISTRICT
HARRIS-GALVESTON SUBSIDENCE DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
HARRIS-GALVESTON SUBSIDENCE DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.